MA H3809 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the scheduling of employees. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the scheduling of employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1544 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1548 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2196 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2197 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback