MA H3808 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to nonpayment of rent or foreclosure by federal employees during a federal government shutdown. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting federal employees in the commonwealth during a federal government shutdown

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1626 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1650 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2152 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1629 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback