MA H3805 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for hospital grade breast pumps. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to hospital grade breast pumps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1927 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S729 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1986 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S167 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S729 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1986 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S167 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3805 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3805.pdf |