MA H3793 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the hands-free use of mobile telephones while driving
Title
Requiring the hands-free use of mobile telephones while driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 59 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | House | Reported by H4203 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Boncore-Brownsberger-Tran), in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-10 | House | Committee of conference appointed - (Straus-Wagner-Whelan) |
2019-06-10 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2019-06-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Amended (Boncore) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2250 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 2 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 59) |
2019-05-15 | House | Amendment 7 adopted |
2019-05-15 | House | Amendment 6 adopted, as changed |
2019-05-15 | House | Quorum Roll Call - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 58) |
2019-05-15 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2019-05-15 | House | Amendment 2 rejected |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Order adopted, see H3794 |
2019-05-15 | House | New draft of H3149 |
2019-05-15 | House | Pending new draft of H3149 |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3149 (Replaces) 2019-05-15 - New draft substituted, see H3793
H3794 (Replaced by) 2019-05-15 - Adopted, see H3149
H3179 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Accompanied H3149
H4203 (Replaces) 2019-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2019
H3794 (Replaced by) 2019-05-15 - Adopted, see H3149
H3179 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Accompanied H3149
H4203 (Replaces) 2019-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3793 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3793.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj05152019_RollCalls.pdf |