MA H3785 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4722

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-15)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to disability or death caused by post-traumatic stress disorder for certain members of state retirement systems. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the disability or death caused by post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD)

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4722
2019-09-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2019-05-13SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-13HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3214 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Senate concurred
H2285 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2261
H2381 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2261
S1509 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2164 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - House concurred
H3897 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4177
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback