MA H3777 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4908
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to parenting time plans for certain foster children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Minimizing trauma for foster children through improved parenting time plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4908 |
2021-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
H236 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5285
H1327 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
H192 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
H2010 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
H4908 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
H236 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5285
H1327 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
H192 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
H2010 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
H4908 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3777 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3777.pdf |