MA H3776 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a substance abuse protection fund. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Establishing a substance abuse protection fund
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4539 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H3107 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H2967 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S164 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3807 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4539 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H2967 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S164 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3807 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4539 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3776 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3776.pdf |