MA H3762 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a penalty for the sale, preparation, manufacturing, or distribution of kratom products that are contaminated with dangerous non-kratom substances. The Judiciary.
Title
Concerning the regulation of Kratom
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2152 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S1387
H3230 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
H4490 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2712 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3230 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
H4490 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2712 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3762 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3762.pdf |