MA H3761 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Patrick of North Andover, a petition of [PETITIONERS LIST] [BACKING TEXT]. House Ways and Means.
Title
MAKING APPROPRIATIONS FOR THE FISCAL YEAR 2012 TO PROVIDE FOR SUPPLEMENTING CERTAIN EXISTING APPROPRIATIONS AND FOR CERTAIN OTHER ACTIVITIES AND PROJECTS
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-01-12 | House | Reported, in part, by H3878 |
2011-12-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-12-29 | House | Order adopted to carry-over to second annual session |
2011-10-31 | House | Reported, in part, by H3781 |
2011-10-20 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3761 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17497&generalCourtId=1 |