MA H3755 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2619

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to address workforce shortages in early education through educational coursework and apprenticeship participation. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to rebuilding our early education workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-07SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2619
2023-10-05JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-04-10SenateSenate concurred
2023-04-10HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S284 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
H2988 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2619 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - New draft substituted, see S2697
S2707 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4816 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback