MA H3741 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1787
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Norfolk County Retirement Board to acquire real property to use as administrative offices
Title
Authorizing the Norfolk County Retirement Board to acquire real property to use as administrative offices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-05-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-05-08 | House | New draft of H1787 |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1787 (Replaces) 2019-05-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3741
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H216 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H216 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3741 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3741.pdf |