MA H3738 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the rapid, accessible and equitable administration of the COVID-19 vaccine. Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management.
Title
To ensure the rapid, accessible and equitable administration of the COVID-19 vaccine
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Santiago [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] | Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] |
Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4938 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management |
Same As/Similar To
S1426 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2276 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
S2985 (Similar To) 2022-07-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2022
S2982 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2985
H4938 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3456 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H2276 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
S2985 (Similar To) 2022-07-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2022
S2982 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2985
H4938 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3456 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3738 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3738.pdf |