MA H3716 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to motor vehicle insurance liability during claims investigations. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To clarify auto insurance liability during claims investigations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-06HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1552 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2684 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2685 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H1693 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H98 (Similar To) 2019-05-29 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback