MA H3710 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing the town of Tisbury to pay a certain unpaid bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Tisbury to pay a certain unpaid bill

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-21SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2017-09-18HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-07-05HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended
2017-07-05HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-06-29HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 222
2017-05-22SenateSenate concurred
2017-05-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3655 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Senate concurred
H3656 (Similar To) 2017-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2017
H3671 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S1132 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2017

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback