MA H3691 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to energy assessments and energy efficiency improvements at schools and public institutions of higher education. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to healthy and sustainable schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-07-14 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2127 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3691 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3691.pdf |