MA H3684 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3965

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Patricia Harrison, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Patricia Harrison, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HousePlaced in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-07-11HouseFor message, see H3965
2019-07-10 Governor returned to the House with veto
2019-07-01SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-07-01HouseEnacted
2019-07-01SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-07-01HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-06-27SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-06-27SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-04-25SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2019-04-24HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2019-04-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-04-18HouseRules suspended
2019-04-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-04-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-04-08SenateSenate concurred
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2369 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3900 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3914 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3965 (Replaced by) 2019-07-11 - See H3684

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback