MA H3679 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a task force (including members of the General Court) to study and make actionable recommendations regarding public ownership of public utilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating public ownership of public utilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-07-07JointHearing rescheduled to 10/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2829 (Similar To) 2024-06-25 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2838
S2838 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed - (Roy-Haggerty-Jones), in concurrence
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback