MA H367 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S213

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied S213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representatives Cutler of Duxbury and LaNatra of Kingston, a petition of Josh S. Cutler, Kathleen R. LaNatra and others that the Office of Business Development establish a MassMade program to identify, connect and support businesses that produce consumer goods in the Commonwealth. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the MassMade Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateAccompanied S213
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H329 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H195 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H221 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1048 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H928 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S221 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S213 (Replaced by) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback