MA H3656 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Xiarhos of Barnstable, a petition of Steven George Xiarhos and Susan L. Moran (with the approval of the county commissioners) that John R. Stowe, Jr., be authorized to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing John R. Stowe, Jr. to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-31 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2024
2024-01-25SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2024-01-25HouseEnacted
2024-01-22SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-22SenateRules suspended
2024-01-22SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-09-28SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2023-09-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-08-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-08-07HouseRules suspended
2023-08-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-07-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-04-04JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H5065 (Similar To) 2024-10-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H5084
H5148 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback