MA H3654 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to manufacturers of certain drugs. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to compensation for victims of opioids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H952 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1579 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1579 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3654 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3654.pdf |