MA H3632 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the prohibition of motor vehicle operators to make turns at certain red lights. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding right of way violations (CeCelia's Law)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-09HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2022-02-09HouseRules suspended
2022-02-09HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2022-01-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-12-06JointHearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2189 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback