MA H3629 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the administration of opioid maintenance treatment in the prescription monitoring program. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the prescription monitoring program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 |
2023-09-27 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-27 | House | Accompanied by S1384 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1384 (Similar To) 2023-09-27 - Accompanied H3629
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3629 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3629.pdf |