MA H3627 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing the Blue Star Family license plate in honor of police officers killed in the line of duty. Transportation.
Title
Establishing the Blue Star Family license plate
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2376 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3627 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3627.pdf |