MA H3605 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Boldyga of Southwick, a petition of Nicholas A. Boldyga that the Department of Public Health establish procedures for the granting of psilocybin facilitators licenses. Public Health.
Title
Concerning the legal use of the plant medicine known as psilocybin for therapeutic, spiritual, and medicinal purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3605 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3605.pdf |