MA H3604 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4739

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Ayers of Quincy, a petition of Bruce J. Ayers that the Department of Public Health study the feasibility of incentivizing inpatient psychiatric hospitals to admit patients directly from community behavioral health centers. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Massachusetts Department of Public Health to study the feasibility of incentivizing inpatient psychiatric hospitals to admit patients directly from community behavioral health centers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-01HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4739
2023-11-03JointHearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1108 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4739 (Replaced by) 2024-07-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback