MA H3597 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4797

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4797
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to discrimination in blood donations. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to eliminating discrimination in blood donations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4797
2018-05-17SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4797 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback