MA H3590 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4517

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to homestead protection. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase the protection of homestead

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4517
2023-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2476 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2550
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2755 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2757 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback