MA H3585 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4404
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Elugardo of Boston, a petition of Nika C. Elugardo and others for the establishment of a special commission (including members of the General Court) to investigate the diversion of funds from the United States government’s nuclear modernization programs to meet the transportation infrastructure costs of the Commonwealth. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolve establishing a commission on shifting funds from new nuclear weapons to transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4404 |
2019-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
H4404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1455 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
H4404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3585 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3585.pdf |