MA H3579 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4674
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the operation of electric buses by transit agencies and school bus operators. Transportation.
Title
Transitioning Massachusetts to electric buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4674 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 18, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4674 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3579.pdf |