MA H3579 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 203 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2012 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements (see House, No. 3535), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment E of House, No. 3581).
Title
Relative to the adult day health program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2011-07-27 | House | Re-enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 92) |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-07-27 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-07-25 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Further amendment adopted |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Governor's amendment rejected |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-07-20 | House | Amendment adopted |
2011-07-20 | House | Governors amendment rejected |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2011-07-11 | House | For message, see H3581, Attachment E |
2011-07-11 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2011-07-11 | House | Enacted as section 203 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H3535 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3579 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17144&generalCourtId=1 |