MA H3570 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4422

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reimbursing local school transportation of foster children. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairly reimbursing local school transportation of foster children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-26HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4422
2023-10-20JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S65 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4704
H157 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4704
S80 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2804
H4422 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4704 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback