MA H3561 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to limiting employer medical assistance contributions. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting the employer medical assistance contribution tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H2495 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
S1763 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2622 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2627 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2624 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2629 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1623 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H4283 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback