MA H3559 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electric vehicles and the electrification of public transportation. Transportation.
Title
Relative to public transit electrification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2292 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
S2297 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3559 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3559.pdf |