MA H3553 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to education and training for members of local planning boards and zoning boards of appeals. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Regarding mandatory land use board training
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Kassner [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Rep. Sally Kerans [D] |
Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3553 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3553.pdf |