MA H3547 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to eliminating certain payments made to disabled veterans from the computation of rental housing vouchers. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to exempt disabled veteran income for housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4230 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 13, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4230 (Replaced by) 2016-05-11 - New draft substituted, see H4278
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3547 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3547.pdf |