MA H3543 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4525
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of certain biological agents on cannabis. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Expanding the use of organic pest control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4525 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Leicester Public Library |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1130 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
H3536 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4327
H3538 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4522
H3537 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3704 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H4121 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4525 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1130 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
H3536 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4327
H3538 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4522
H3537 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3704 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H4121 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4525 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3543 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3543.pdf |