MA H353 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to gas fitters licenses for employees of gas companies. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to amend a Master plumbers or gas fitters, journeymen and apprentices; licensing; advertising; display of license of certificate
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. William Crocker [R] |
Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2822 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1950 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2883 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1959 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1952 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1950 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2883 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1959 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1952 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H353.pdf |