MA H3525 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Lombardo of Billerica, a petition of Marc T. Lombardo that school buses be equipped with front dashboard video cameras with recording and storage capabilities for the purpose of recording traffic incidences. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding school bus equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11JointHearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3631 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2311 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
S1572 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3440 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4478
H2450 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1569 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1632 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2326 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback