MA H3522 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure full participation in the marijuana industry. Cannabis Policy.
Title
To ensure full participation in the marijuana industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2650 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H3263 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
S1123 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2650
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2650 (Replaced by) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1123 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2650
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2650 (Replaced by) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3522 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3522.pdf |