MA H3507 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3768

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the cultivation of industrial hemp. Marijuana Policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cultivation of industrial crops

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3768
2017-04-21JointHearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-04-21JointHearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy

Same As/Similar To

H1056 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1074 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback