MA H3500 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4900
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - New draft substituted, see H4900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - New draft substituted, see H4900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain flame retardants. Public Health.
Title
To protect children, families, and firefighters from harmful flame retardants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | New draft substituted, see H4900 |
2020-11-04 | House | New draft substituted, see H4900 |
2020-11-04 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-11-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-11-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-11-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4900 |
2019-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1230 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S2338
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4900 (Replaced by) 2021-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2020
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4900 (Replaced by) 2021-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3500.pdf |