MA H350 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4680
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a board of registration of Asian bodywork therapy. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to protecting the lineages of Asian bodywork therapies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4680 |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4680 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2805 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2813
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
S2475 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Reported by H4999
S2805 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2813
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
S2475 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Reported by H4999
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H350 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H350.pdf |