MA H3492 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2306

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include the dive team, hazardous devices section and crime scene services of the state police in the law concerning disability or death caused by certain conditions of Cancer. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to amending disability or death caused by certain conditions of Cancer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-01-27HouseAccompanied by H2306
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2306 (Replaces) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback