MA H3487 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to safe patient handling in certain health facilities. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to safe patient handling in certain health facilities

Sponsors

Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]
Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H158 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H990 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1119 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
H1751 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S542 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback