MA H3486 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on adoption
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Ayers of Quincy, a petition of Bruce J. Ayers for the adoption of resolutions by the General Court memorializing the Congress of the United States to update the Drug Addiction Treatment Act of 2000 and remove excessive training requirements mandated for obtaining a waiver to prescribe buprenorphine. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions urging the Congress of the United States to update the Drug Addiction Treatment Act of 2000 and remove excessive training requirements mandated for obtaining a waiver to prescribe buprenorphine

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-01HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on adoption
2024-03-04HouseResolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-01-08JointHearing scheduled for 01/16/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S2319 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Resolution reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3016 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on adoption

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback