MA H3483 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Andover to convey a certain parcel of land. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Andover to exchange certain parcels of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call #242 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2014-01-29 | House | Enacted 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 283) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-08-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-08-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-07-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3483 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3483.pdf |