MA H3476 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4624

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the sale of imitation firearms in the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to imitation firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4624
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-14HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-01-28SenateSenate concurred
2016-01-27HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary
2016-01-27HouseRead second
2016-01-27HouseRules suspended
2016-01-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-01-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-01-04JointHearing scheduled for 01/07/2016 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H4624 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback