MA H3463 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to chemical analysis of blood in the event of death or bodily harm to another while operating a motor vehicle. The Judiciary.
Title
Amending fatal motor-vehicle accident investigation procedure
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3259 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3060 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3253 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1417 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2204 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2214
S2214 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3259 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3060 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3253 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1417 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2204 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2214
S2214 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3463.pdf |