MA H3460 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 332 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 332 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the composition of the Boston Arts Commission. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding the composition of the Boston Arts Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 332 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-13 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-10-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-06-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3121 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H324 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1814 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3457 (Similar To) 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
H3896 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2525 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H324 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1814 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3457 (Similar To) 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
H3896 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2525 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3460 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3460.pdf |