MA H3446 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Durant of Spencer (by request), a petition of Paul Joseph that the Atlantic Cod be imprinted on non-special number license plates. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to motor vehicle number plates in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20JointHearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2330 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback